+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 3
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 09, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB453_S_5080
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
March 27, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor