+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
- Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor