+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Elections
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 281-N
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections
- Received and Introduced
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 8
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 13 March 2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 06, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2014_SB45_H_3810
Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Elections
CR_2013_SB45_H_1979
Died on House Calendar
CR_2013_SB45_S_1489
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
March 13, 2013: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor