+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 21 Nay: 19
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Type:
Primary Sponsor