+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received and Introduced
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 21 Nay: 19
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Smith was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Smith
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2016_SB439_S_4131
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Smith was adopted
CR_2016_SB439_S_3876
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor