+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 29, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB436_S_4480
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
March 15, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor