+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 17, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received and Introduced
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator LaTurner
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator LaTurner was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2016_SB428_H_4085
Died on House Calendar
FA_2016_SB428_S_3867
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator LaTurner was adopted
CR_2016_SB428_S_3602
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor