+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012
On May 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 0
On May 20, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 13
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rhoades, Representative Kelley and Representative Feuerborn appointed as second conferees
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as second conferees
- Substitute motion to not adopt the Conference Committee Report and appoint a new Conference Committee.
- Motion to adopt Conference Committee Report
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 114 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rhoades, Representative Kelley and Representative Feuerborn appointed as conferees
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 2
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 6
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, February 17, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CCR_2012_SB425_H_5680
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_SB425_S_4271
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 20, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 15, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 28, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor