+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 3, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Type:
Primary Sponsor