+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 06 April 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 03, 2012
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_SB424_H_4784
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_SB424_S_4284
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2012: Concurred with amendments
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor