+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died on General Orders
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, February 17, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB423_S_4968
Died on General Orders
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor