+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 12, 2022
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 6, 2022
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 10
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 106 Nay: 10
- Conference committee report now available
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative S. Johnson, Representative Croft and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Xu
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Waymaster
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waymaster was adopted
- Representative S. Johnson raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was rejected Yea: 38 Nay: 79
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 113 Nay: 5
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Billinger , Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk as conferees
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance and Pensions
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 7, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 9, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor