+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 28, 2022
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 9, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 10, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor