+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Committee
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Ruled materially changed and referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 81 Nay: 41
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 785 Docking
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_SB413_H_4960
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_SB413_S_4453
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
March 7, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Commerce
Type:
Primary Sponsor