+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 06, 2018
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Dove and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers as conferees
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 109 Nay: 15
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELLED
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2018_SB410_H_3806
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2018_SB410_S_3325
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor