+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Vote
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor