+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Conference
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senator Bruce motioned to concur
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Motion to lay on table adopted; Yea: 22 Nay: 17
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hedke
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative O'Brien
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative O'Brien was adopted
- Representative McCray-Miller raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hedke was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Knox
- Representative Loganbill raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted Yea: 68 Nay: 52
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 70 Nay: 52
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (5)
FA_2012_SB394_H_5055
Representative Loganbill raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
FA_2012_SB394_H_5044
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative O'Brien was adopted
FA_2012_SB394_H_5142
Representative McCray-Miller raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
FA_2012_SB394_H_4983
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
CR_2012_SB394_H_4685
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2012: Motion to lay on table adopted
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor