+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2016, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2016_SB391_S_3556
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor