+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Conference
On May 10, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rhoades, Representative Kelley and Representative Feuerborn appointed as conferees
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On May 9, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
On May 8, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Representative Johnson raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Trimmer
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative S. Gatewood was rejected Yea: 41 Nay: 79
- Representative Rhoades raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative S. Gatewood
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 08, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
FA_2012_SB39_H_5601
Representative Johnson raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
FA_2012_SB39_H_5589
Representative Rhoades raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
FA_2012_SB39_S_4408
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was adopted
CR_2012_SB39_S_3491
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor