+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 20, 2019
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 15, 2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Received and Introduced
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor