+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 29, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 22 Nay: 18
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 21, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_SB379_H_5483
Died on House Calendar
CR_2012_SB379_S_4719
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
March 15, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Agriculture
Type:
Primary Sponsor