+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Calendar and Printing
- Received and Introduced
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Longbine
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2014_SB375_S_4099
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was adopted
CR_2014_SB375_S_4044
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
March 25, 2014: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor