+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 20, 2011
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 25 May 2011
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
- Motion to Reconsider Adopted
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 6 Nay: 33
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Conference committee report now available
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller appointed as 2nd conferees
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as 2nd conferees
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller appointed as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 3
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kinzer
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kinzer
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 07, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 6
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (6)
CCR_2011_SB37_H_2731
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
FA_2011_SB37_H_2257
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was rejected
FA_2011_SB37_H_2265
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted
FA_2011_SB37_H_2299
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
CR_2011_SB37_H_2121
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2011_SB37_S_1126
Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 10, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 9, 2011: Conference Committee Report not adopted
May 5, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 22, 2011: Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
February 15, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor