+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 23 , 2016
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 18, 2016
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 02, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
- Received and Introduced
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 03, 2016, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2016_SB369_H_3746
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
CR_2016_SB369_S_3318
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor