+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Conference
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 114 Nay: 8
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 4
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CCR_2012_SB367_H_5329
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_SB367_H_4748
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor