+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 03 April 2012
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2012
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Suellentrop was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Suellentrop
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Scapa was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Scapa
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2012_SB366_H_5046
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Suellentrop was adopted
CR_2012_SB366_S_4352
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2012_SB366_H_5011
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Scapa was rejected
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor