+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 7, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 3
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 10, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor