+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 16 May 2011
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 06, 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 24 Nay: 15
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Representative Loganbill replaces Representative Pauls on the Conference Committee
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 97 Nay: 26
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kinzer
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Bollier
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Bollier was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 22, 2011, 12:00 PM Room 346-S
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 09, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
FA_2011_SB36_H_2500
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted
FA_2011_SB36_H_2547
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Bollier was rejected
CR_2011_SB36_H_2416
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2011_SB36_S_1212
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (3)
April 27, 2011: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 31, 2011: Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
February 22, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor