+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 5, 2017
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 31, 2017
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 3
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 546-S
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2017_SB36_H_1462
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
CR_2017_SB36_S_0898
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor