+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died on General Orders
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor