+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 31 , 2016
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 28, 2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 4
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
- Received and Introduced
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 03, 2016, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2016_SB352_H_3961
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
CR_2016_SB352_S_3278
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Commerce
Type:
Primary Sponsor