+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 22, 2011, 12:00 PM Room 346-S
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 02, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2011_SB35_H_2415
Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
CR_2011_SB35_S_0860
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Vote
February 9, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor