+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 32 Nay: 6
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee and Representative Ruiz, S. appointed as conferees
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Hilderbrand , Senator Gossage and Senator Pettey as conferees
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 110 Nay: 10
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 7, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 6
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, February 7, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Type:
Primary Sponsor