+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 783 Docking
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 26 Nay: 14
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, February 06, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB348_S_3883
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Local Government
Type:
Primary Sponsor