+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 27 Nay: 12
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 3
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 7, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Straub was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Straub
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 20, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor