+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 22, 2011, 12:00 PM Room 346-S
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 07, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 34 Nay: 4
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2011_SB34_H_2414
Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307)
CR_2011_SB34_S_1121
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Vote
February 15, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor