+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2018
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 7, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 4
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kelly, Representative Powell and Representative Finney appointed as conferees
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers as conferees
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
- Representative Powell raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained Yea: 77 Nay: 45
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
- Representative Powell raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
- Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
- Received and Introduced
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 546-S
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CCR_2018_SB335_H_4180
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
FA_2018_SB335_H_3696
Representative Powell raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
CR_2018_SB335_H_3611
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2018_SB335_S_3001
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor