+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
- Referred to Committee on Education
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 4
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Abrams
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Education and referred to Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Rereferred to Committee on Education
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, February 10, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, February 07, 2014, 10:00 AM Room 144-S
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2014_SB335_S_4052
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was adopted
FA_2014_SB335_S_4028
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was adopted
CR_2014_SB335_S_3720
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means