+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 1
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor