+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 03 April 2012
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2012
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor