+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Committee
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2017, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2017_SB33_S_0602
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Type:
Primary Sponsor