+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 09, 2014
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
- Conference committee report now available
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rubin, Representative Gonzalez and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator King , Senator Haley and Senator Smith as conferees
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Finch
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finch was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 06, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Received and Introduced
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2014_SB329_H_4437
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
FA_2014_SB329_H_3987
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finch was adopted
CR_2014_SB329_H_3929
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 1, 2014: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 30, 2014: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 20, 2014: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 19, 2014: Consent Calendar Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor