+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 03 April 2012
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2012
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 94 Nay: 30
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 4
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, February 17, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB322_S_4251
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor