+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 03 April 2012
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2012
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 8:25 AM Room 548-S
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB320_H_4690
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2012: Concurred with amendments
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor