+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 28 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 117 Nay: 6
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 783-DOB
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Natural Resources
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB316_S_3837
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor