+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 21, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2015_SB31_S_0820
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor