+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 18, 2012
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 93 Nay: 20
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller appointed as conferees
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CCR_2012_SB306_H_5652
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_SB306_H_4688
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 15, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 14, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor