+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB305_S_3937
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor