+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 1
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2012_SB304_H_5275
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_SB304_H_4812
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_SB304_S_4279
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 14, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 11, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Joint Committee on Administrative Rules and Regulations
Type:
Primary Sponsor