+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 3
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Longbine
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Brungardt was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Brungardt
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2012_SB299_H_5276
Died on House Calendar
FA_2012_SB299_S_4133
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was adopted
FA_2012_SB299_S_4047
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Brungardt was adopted
+ − Vote
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor